Lundahl et al v. Dunn et al
Defendant: B J Brown, Craig Christensen, Lon Colton, Oneida County, Jaime De Anda, Does 1-10, Stephen Dunn, First American Title Insurance Company, Sharon Hess, Kent Higgins, Dixie Hubbard, Kimberley Johnson, Stephen Kenyon, Key Bank, Law Offices of Merrill and Merrill, David Nye, Detective Schwartz, Jeff Semrad, Dustin Smith, US Bank and Doug Williams
307) 212-6888 (fax: Logan Lundahl and Holli Telford
Case Number: 4:2015cv03133
Filed: November 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the Clerk shall file the "subpoena and virus notice" as miscellaneous documents in all District of Nebraska cases where Holli Lundahl Telford is a party. Treated as motions, said documents are denied and the court shall take no further action. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the above-entitled cases are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will issue. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (LRM)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : all pro se (unrepresented) parties in any of these cases shall file the required information, to comply with NEGenR 1.3, with this court no later than January 19, 2021. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal or other appropriate sanctions. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the undersigned has referred two of the above-captioned actions to the United States Attorney. Therefore, in the interest of judicial economy, all the cases captioned above will be stayed until further order of the court. Th e clerk of court is hereby directed to terminate all pending motions in these cases for statistical purposes. The motions are terminated without prejudice to reassertion at the time the stay is lifted in these actions. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (JLS, )
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court acknowledges that it received the documents attached to this order by fax on October 1, 2016. These documents will not be treated as pleadings in these actions, but rather as correspondence with the court. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JLS, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2016: # 1 Documents Received by fax October 1, 2016, # 2 Documents Received by fax October 1, 2016) (JLS, ).
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon its own motion, the court orders as follows in the cases captioned above: 1. All further proceedings in these actions are stayed until further order of the court. Counsel is under no obligation to respond to pending motions at this time. 2. The clerk of court shall enter a copy of this Memorandum and Order in all of the above-captioned cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(JAB)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding hearings held on September 19, 2016. IT IS TEMPORARILY ORDERED that:1. Ms. Lundahl, Mr. Fritts, Lisa Nelson, E.H. Neilson, Elham Neilson, D. Christinsen, Dillon Christinsen, Dillon Christiansen, K.S. Christiansen, a nd Anthony Kenyon Cross and any agents, servants, employees or other persons under their joint, sole or several control or any entities in which they or any of them have any interest, are instructed as follows: - A. Until further order of the u ndersigned, and except as provided in paragraph 3, the foregoing persons or entities are barred from filing any pleadings or documents in the following cases: Nelson, et al. v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, et al., 8:16CV368-RGK -PRSE; Lundahl, et al. v. Dunn, et al., 4:15CV3133-RGK-PRSE; Telford, et al. v. United States of America, et al., 4:16CV3147-RGK-PRSE; Lundahl, et al., v. Hoffman, et al., 4:16CV3000-RGK-PRSE; Bell, et al., v. The Gerald and Mary Lundahl Living Trust , et al., 7:16CV5001-RGK-CRZ1; and Neilson v. HSBC, et al., 4:16CV3093-RGK-PRSE. - B. The Clerk shall enter a copy of this Memorandum and Order in all of the foregoing cases. Except as noted in paragraph 3, if any of the above persons or entities attempt to file a pleading or other document in the foregoing cases, the Clerk shall immediately notify the undersigned and hold unfiled such pleadings or documents until the undersigned provides further direction.2. Until further order of this court, the persons or entities described in paragraph 1 are barred from filing any new action in this court or removing any new action from state court to this court. If any such action or removal is attempted, the Clerk shall immediately noti fy the undersigned and hold unfiled such documents until the undersigned gives further direction. 3. On or before 4:30 PM on Monday, October 3, 2016, Ms. Lundahl shall cause the original documents establishing the Shanandoah Trust, the predeces sor to said trust or any affiliated entities of such trust to be delivered to the Clerk of this Court in Lincoln, Nebraska. The original document(s) must arrive no later than 4:30 PM. Upon receipt of such documents, the Clerk shall notify the under signed and the undersigned will provide instructions about the handling of such documents.4. Anthony Kenyon Cross shall have no obligation to participate in any of these cases on behalf of K.S. Christiansen. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint no later than July 14, 2016. Should Plaintiffs fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of court is directed to set a case management deadline using the following text: July 14, 2016: check for second amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Within 30 days, Plaintiffs must file a response with the court showing cause for why all claims against Defendants should not be dismissed as untimely under the applicable statutes of limitations. Absent a showing of good cau se, this case will be dismissed. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline in this matter: May 16, 2016: check for Plaintiffs' response. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundahl et al v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lon Colton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime De Anda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Merrill and Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Semrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
307) 212-6888 (fax: Logan Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
307) 212-6888 (fax: Holli Telford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?