Cyclonaire Holding Corp. v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: Cyclonaire Holding Corp.
Defendant: Donald E. Baker, Glenda Baker, Jerry L. Elfring, Bruce A. Hocking, Chester Kliewer, Deryl L. Kliewer, John Meola, Merlin C. Mohnike, Joseph B. Morris, Roger L. Quaintance, Ryan R. Quick, Robert D. Randall, Patricia Saltzman, Scott Schmid and Fred Weuertele
Case Number: 4:2016cv00467
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Within forty-five (45) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court, together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The clerk shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 13, 2018 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by Thomas E. Johnson, as counsel of record for Plaintiff, (Filing No. 88 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
February 8, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 3/20/2018 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Other provisions attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 12, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 23, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 72 Stipulation; granting 71 Motion for Leave. As to Defendant Quick, claims 9-12 are dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff moving to amend its complaint if discovery reveals that Defendant Quick participated in alleged fraud. Defendant Quick's amended answer shall be filed on or before August 30, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 26, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that paragraphs 9 & 11 of the Final Progression Order filed June 23, 2017 (Filing no. 63 ) are amended as follows: 9) The deposition deadline is July 31, 2018. 11) The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is September 4, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyclonaire Holding Corp. v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Baker
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Baker
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L. Elfring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A. Hocking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Kliewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deryl L. Kliewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin C. Mohnike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L. Quaintance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan R. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Weuertele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyclonaire Holding Corp.
Represented By: Thomas E. Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas K. Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?