Davis v. City of Creighton et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary Davis
Defendant: City of Creighton and Bob Jensen
Case Number: 4:2016cv03001
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - The parties' motion, (Filing No. 68 ), is granted. The pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on August 14, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss the outcome of the parties' mediation and, if necessary, re-scheduling the trial and pretrial conference. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 10 ), to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Richard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on August 6, 2018, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on July 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet plus telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (Filing No. 10 ) to participate. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on July 16, 2018. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment is March 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Amend,A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on February 28, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. to reset the dispositive motion deadline and to re-schedule the trial and pretrial conference. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 10 ), to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The settlement conference is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend Progression Order. Jury Trial set for 11/06/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf for 5 trial days. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2017 at 09:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CS)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2017 at 02:00 PM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 5/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2016 at 01:00 PM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint, (Filing No. 11 ), is granted. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before April 28, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Creighton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Creighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Davis
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?