Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ameritas Holding Company, Ameritas Investment Corp. and Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv03006
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER AMENDING CASE PROGRESSION SCHEDULE: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/11/2017 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart to discuss the status of case progression, the trial and pretrial conference settings, and the potential settlement of this case. Counsel shall use the telephone conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 35), to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Defendant's motion to bifurcate, (Filing No. 46 ), is granted. This case is severed for trial. The Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim will be tried first and separately from the remaining claims in Plainti ffs' complaint. Subject to any mutual agreement or stipulation between the parties to the contrary, discovery on all claims but the breach of contract claim is stayed pending resolution of the contract claim. The Plaintiffs' Motion to C ompel, (Filing No. 69 ) is denied without prejudice to refiling as set forth in the body of this order. Counsel shall email chambers within five days of this order to schedule a planning conference to discuss further progression of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that the deposition deadline is extended to March 27, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 JOINT MOTION to Extend and Reschedule Discovery Deadlines. The deadline for completing written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is March 27, 2017. Motions to compel Rule 33 throu gh 36 discovery must be filed by April 10, 2017. A Telephone Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on 4/6/2017 at 01:00 PM to discuss the status of case progression and potential settlement. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 35), to participate in the call. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is April 28, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 49 Joint Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameritas Life Insurance Corp. et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameritas Holding Company
Represented By: David M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameritas Investment Corp.
Represented By: David M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameritas Life Insurance Corp.
Represented By: David M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?