Wolfe et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Arlene J. Wolfe and Jack E. Wolfe
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv03040
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - The stipulation filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Bank of America, N.A. 62 , treated as a motion, is granted, and all claims alleged by Plaintiffs against said Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Final judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SLP)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDERthat the stipulation filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing No. 48 ), treated as a motion, is granted, and all claims alleged by Plaintiffs against said Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. This action shall proceed against the remaining Defendant, Bank of America, N.A.. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - To facilitate the parties' early assessment of whether this case will likely be resolved by dispositive motion, settlement, or trial, the parties' current case preparation efforts will focus on obtaining written discovery on Plaint iffs damages claims and taking Plaintiffs' depositions. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on February 17, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss case scheduling, including whether the parties will be engaging in al ternative dispute resolution, along with the anticipated scheduling of those proceedings. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 29 ), to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that the final progression order is amended as follows: Motions to compel Rule 33 through 36 discovery must be filed by February 15, 2017. Note: Motions to compel shall not be filed without first contacting the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference for discussing the parties' dispute. The deadline for identifying expert witnesses expected to testify at the trial, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R . Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), is January 17, 2017. The deadlines for complete expert disclosures for all experts expected to testify at trial, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are: For the plaintiff(s): January 31, 2017. For the defendant(s): February 28, 2017. The deposition deadline is March 31, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is April 14, 2017. The parties are advised, h owever, that the trial and pretrial conference may be continued on the court's own motion if dispositive motions are filed after March 27, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is April 17, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the stipulation filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Trans Union LLC (Filing No. 41 ), treated as a motion, is granted, and all claims alleged by Plaintiffs against said Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. This action shall proceed against the remaining Defendants. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - that the stipulation filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Filing No. 32 ), treated as a motion, is granted, and all claims alleged by Plaintiffs against said Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. This action shall proceed against the remaining Defendants. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The motion to permit Jameson C. Rohrer of Jones Day to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ("Experian"), (filing no. 33 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Jameson C. Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: Randall L. Goyette
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene J. Wolfe
Represented By: Tregg R. Lunn
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Joseph A. Venti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack E. Wolfe
Represented By: Tregg R. Lunn
Represented By: Michael J. Quirk
Represented By: Joseph A. Venti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?