McDonald v. Nebraska Dept. of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Joseph H. McDonald
Defendant: Scott Frakes, Brad Hanson and Nebraska Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2016cv03075
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's official capacity claims against Defendants are dismissed for the reasons set forth in this court's order dated September 29, 2016. (Filing No. 25 .) His indivi dual capacity claims against Frakes and Hanson are dismissed for the reasons set forth above. A separate Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Information (Filing No. 29 ) is denied as moot. It is a duplicate of his Amended Complaint (Filing No. 26 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by October 31, 2016 that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: October 31, 2016 check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Reconsider. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (Filing No. 12 ) is denied. Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee by June 20, 2016. Plaintiff is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case with out further notice. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 3 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The Motion for Pro-Se Work Product Privilege (Filing No. 5 ) is denied as moot. The Motion for Confidential Communication (Filing No. 4 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days. Plaintiff is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss th is case without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 20, 2016: deadline for Plaintiff to pay filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Nebraska Dept. of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?