Neilson v. HSBC et al
Plaintiff: E.H. Neilson
Defendant: James Belcher, Beneficial Wyoming, Inc., K.S. Christiansen, Does 1-10, HSBC, Arvind Karkera, Law Office of Crowley and Fleck, Northern Title Company, United States Postal Service and Wade Waldrip
Case Number: 4:2016cv03093
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the above-entitled cases are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will issue. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (LRM)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk of court is hereby directed to make all sealed documents filed in the above captioned cases available, upon request, to Assistant U.S. States Attorney Jan Sharp and Assistant U.S. Attorney Alan Everett, or any law enforcement officer acting pursuant to their direction. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the undersigned has referred two of the above-captioned actions to the United States Attorney. Therefore, in the interest of judicial economy, all the cases captioned above will be stayed until further order of the court. Th e clerk of court is hereby directed to terminate all pending motions in these cases for statistical purposes. The motions are terminated without prejudice toreassertion at the time the stay is lifted in these actions. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (JLS, )
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court is in receipt of documents mailed to the court by H. Lundahl Telford. The clerk of court is directed to scan these documents and file them as a sealed attachment to this order. The order and attachment shall be fil ed in each of the above-captioned cases. The clerk of court is further directed to keep the original documents received from Ms. Telford under seal in the court vault. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to non-registered pro se parties without attachment/e-mailed to pro se parties)(JLS, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2016: # 1 Sealed Attachment) (JLS, ). Modified on 10/4/2016 to correct typographical error, (JLS, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - I have sought the advice of an Assistant General Counsel at the Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts. I am now in receipt of that advice. A copy of that advice is attached hereto and shall be filed under seal. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Attachment)Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - At my request, a Deputy United States Marshal took photographs of unrepresented persons appearing at hearings held on September 19, 2016, in relation to the above entitled cases. Copies of those photographs are attached. A record should be made of the physical appearance of such persons. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the attached together with this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(JAB)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' motion for extension of time (filing no. 41) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed and e-mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Because I was contacted ex parte, I herewith disclose that ex parte contact. That is, I received an email, a copy of which is attached. No further emails should be sent to the undersigned by any unrepresented party. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed and e-mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding hearings held on September 19, 2016. IT IS TEMPORARILY ORDERED that:1. Ms. Lundahl, Mr. Fritts, Lisa Nelson, E.H. Neilson, Elham Neilson, D. Christinsen, Dillon Christinsen, Dillon Christiansen, K.S. Christiansen, a nd Anthony Kenyon Cross and any agents, servants, employees or other persons under their joint, sole or several control or any entities in which they or any of them have any interest, are instructed as follows: - A. Until further order of the u ndersigned, and except as provided in paragraph 3, the foregoing persons or entities are barred from filing any pleadings or documents in the following cases: Nelson, et al. v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, et al., 8:16CV368-RGK -PRSE; Lundahl, et al. v. Dunn, et al., 4:15CV3133-RGK-PRSE; Telford, et al. v. United States of America, et al., 4:16CV3147-RGK-PRSE; Lundahl, et al., v. Hoffman, et al., 4:16CV3000-RGK-PRSE; Bell, et al., v. The Gerald and Mary Lundahl Living Trust , et al., 7:16CV5001-RGK-CRZ1; and Neilson v. HSBC, et al., 4:16CV3093-RGK-PRSE. - B. The Clerk shall enter a copy of this Memorandum and Order in all of the foregoing cases. Except as noted in paragraph 3, if any of the above persons or entitie s attempt to file a pleading or other document in the foregoing cases, the Clerk shall immediately notify the undersigned and hold unfiled such pleadings or documents until the undersigned provides further direction.2. Until further order of t his court, the persons or entities described in paragraph 1 are barred from filing any new action in this court or removing any new action from state court to this court. If any such action or removal is attempted, the Clerk shall immediately notify the undersigned and hold unfiled such documents until the undersigned gives further direction. 3. On or before 4:30 PM on Monday, October 3, 2016, Ms. Lundahl shall cause the original documents establishing the Shanandoah Trust, the pred ecessor to said trust or any affiliated entities of such trust to be delivered to the Clerk of this Court in Lincoln, Nebraska. The original document(s) must arrive no later than 4:30 PM. Upon receipt of such documents, the Clerk shall notify the u ndersigned and the undersigned will provide instructions about the handling of such documents.4. Anthony Kenyon Cross shall have no obligation to participate in any of these cases on behalf of K.S. Christiansen. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Filed as directed in other cases) (JAB)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant K.S. Christiansen and Plaintiff E.H. Neilson are ordered to appear before the undersigned United States district judge, in Courtroom No. 2, Robert V. Denney United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centenni al Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska, on September 19, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. Failure to appear as ordered may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the imposition of monetary sanctions, barring one or more of the summoned liti gants from prosecuting or defending cases in this court, and dismissal with prejudice of the claims or defenses of one or more of the summoned litigants. The other parties to this action are not required to attend the hearing, but may appear if they so choose. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed and e-mailed to pro se party as needed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neilson v. HSBC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Belcher
Represented By: James R. Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Wyoming, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.S. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvind Karkera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Crowley and Fleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Waldrip
Represented By: Jesse B. Naiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.H. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?