Kopecky v. Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Kopecky
Defendant: Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03124
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT - On the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (filing 36 ), this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend Progression Order. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 8/2 9/2017 at 01:00 PM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 08:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case (Filing No. 11 ) to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CS)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kopecky v. Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kopecky
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?