Bush v. Mapes Inc.
Plaintiff: Charlie B. Bush, Jr.
Defendant: Mapes Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03136
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to pro se party and as directed)(SLP)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's claim that he received a one-day suspension because of his race may proceed to service of process. Upon being served, Defendant will be required to respond only to that claim. To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the Clerk of the Court will provide. The Clerk of the Court shall send ONE (1) Summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order . Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the Court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the Court will sign the Summons form, to be forwarded with a copy of the Complaint and the Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve the Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint without payment of costs or fees. Service may be by certified mail pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and Nebraska law in the discretion of the Marshal. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint and Amended Complaint, and Plaintiff does not need to do so. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 requires service of a complaint on a defendant within 90 days of filing the complaint. However, because in this order Plaintiff is informed for the first time of these requirements, Plaintiff is granted, on the court's own mot ion, an extension of time until 90 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on Defendant within 90 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. A defendant has twenty-one (21) days after receipt of the summons to answer or otherwise respond to a complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "January 18, 2017: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiffs will have 30 days in which to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief can be granted. Failure to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: October 12, 2016: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of h is claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Mapes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie B. Bush, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?