Cecetka v. Lincoln Regional Center et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Cecetka
Defendant: Sherri Browning, Psychologist Charles Darrow, Sherri Dawson, Medical Director Roger Donovick, CMSW Suprevisor Jennifer Jennings, Lincoln Regional Center, Director of Nursing Cheryl McMurry, RN Nathan Nedley, Courtney Phillips, Treatment Specialist Michael Roberts, Psychiatrist Roy Sanaf, APRN Mary Scherling and Acting CEO Stacey Werth-Sweeney
Case Number: 4:2016cv03140
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER that the clerk shall administratively close this case. It may be reopened if the settlement agreement is not approved by the legislature. Within 30 days after the approval of the settlement, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dism issal or other dispositive stipulation with the clerk of the court, together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. The clerk shall set an internal case management deadline for June 30, 2020 stating: Check status of settlement approval. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER- Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court, together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The clerk shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 8/28/2019.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER - The Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants (filing 168 ) is granted. Phillips, Dawson, Roberts and Jennings are terminated as parties. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC that no motions challenging the admissibility of expert testimony on Daubert or related grounds will be considered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER - After conferring with counsel, (Audio File 147 ), it is Ordered the Jury Trial of this case is set to commence on 8/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM, and will be conducted by Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER - A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on May 7, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the trial and pretrial conference settings, and whether the parties are interested in alternative dispute resolution. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon the stipulation of the parties, (filing 112 ), and the Court's acceptance of the same, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Protective Order is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER that LRC's Motion to Quash (Filing No. 61 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 63 unopposed Motion to Extend. Deadlines extended as stated. The trial and pretrial conference dates are vacated. A status conference to discuss resetting both trial and pretrial conference dates and to discuss the status of case progression will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on August 14, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by David A. Lopez, as counsel of record for Defendants, (Filing No. 32 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecetka v. Lincoln Regional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psychologist Charles Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director Roger Donovick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMSW Suprevisor Jennifer Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Regional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Nursing Cheryl McMurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Nathan Nedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treatment Specialist Michael Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psychiatrist Roy Sanaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APRN Mary Scherling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting CEO Stacey Werth-Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Cecetka
Represented By: Brian D. Craig
Represented By: Dianne D. DeLair
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Govaerts
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?