Oglesby v. Lesan et al
Plaintiff: Robert Oglesby
Defendant: Chad Hein and Amy Lesan
Case Number: 4:2016cv03189
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER permitting the plaintiff to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Chad Hein's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 101 ) is granted on the merits as to Plaintiff's unreasonable seizure/arrest claim and because Defendant Hein is entitled to qualified immunity on Plainti ff's excessive-force claim. Defendant Amy Lesan's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 104 ) is granted on the merits as to Plaintiff's unreasonable seizure/arrest claim and because Defendant Lesan is entitled to qualified immunity on Plaintiff's excessive-force claim. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Filing No. 122 ) is granted, and the evidentiary objections presented therein are denied. Final judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER - granting 119 Motion to Substitute Attorney. David A. Derbin is substituted for Ryan M. Swaroff and Kayla Hathcote as counsel for Defendant, Amy Lesan. Ryan M. Swaroff and Kayla Hathcote are hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendant, Amy Lesan, and all ECF notices to them shall be terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - Defendants' respective replies on their pending summary judgment motions shall be filed on or before January 5, 2018. The pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. If this case is not fully reso lved by summary judgment, within ten (10) days after the summary judgment rulings, the parties who remain in the case following those rulings shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to re-schedule the pretrial conference and trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - that for the reasons stated in the court's prior order, (Filing No. 41 ), Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the answer of Amy Lesan and the answer and counterclaim of Chad Hein, (Filing No. 80 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying as moot 69 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order; granting 92 Motion for Leave to file a reply; and resolving 74 Motion for Protective Order and 77 Motion to Quash as stated on the record 94 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Statement of Objections (Filing No. 43 ) is denied. The Magistrate Judge's Order entered on May 30, 2017 (Filing No. 41 ), is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Amy Lesan's answer and Defendant Chad Hein's amended answer and counterclaim, (Filing No. 28 ), and on Defendant Amy Lesan's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's demand for a jury trial. (Filing No. 30 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's statement of objections (Filing 26 ) is denied. The Magistrate Judge's text order entered on April 5, 2017 (Filing 21 ), is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff's application, (Filing No. 2 ) is granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order together with two summons form(s) and two USM-285 form(s) t o Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of process on Defendant(s). If Plaintiff is not requesting service by United States Marshal, Plaintiff's attorney of record shall, as soon as possible, complete the summons form(s) and return the m to the Clerk of the court to be issued. The issued summon(s) will then be returned to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service on Defendant(s). If Plaintiff is requesting service by the United States Marshal, Plaintiff's attorney of rec ord shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 form(s) and the summons form(s) and return them to the Clerk of the court. The Clerk of the court will sign the summons form(s), to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint to the U.S . Marshal for service of process. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint; Plaintiff's counsel need not do so. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed) (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oglesby v. Lesan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Oglesby
Represented By: Matt Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?