Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. El Centenario Mexican Grill, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: El Centenario Mexican Grill, LLC and Rodrigo Sanchez
Case Number: 4:2017cv03066
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Unauthorized reception of cable service
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant has failed show cause why this court should not enter a judgment enforcing the parties' settlement of the above-captioned case. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: (Attachments: # 1 settlement agreement)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) Modified on 9/17/2018 to reflect copies mailed as directed. (JAB)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Deadline set for 4/23/2018.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the motion to file an answer out of time, (Filing No. 13 ), is denied without prejudice to re-filing on or before September 13, 2017, and in accordance with this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Defendant El Centenario Mexican Grill, LLC is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Rodrigo Sanchez' motion to strike, (Filing No. 8 ), is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Counsel shall promptly confer to determine if this motion is unopposed. On or before July 27, 2017, either: 1) the parties shall file a joint motion to dismiss or strike "El Centenario Mexican Grill, L.L.C." as a named defenda nt, or 2) Plaintiffs counsel shall file a brief and evidence explaining why the service of process accepted by Rodrigo Sanchez on behalf of "El Centenario Mexican Grill, L.L.C." (see Filing No. 7-1 at 2) is valid service on that entity. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. El Centenario Mexican Grill, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Centenario Mexican Grill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrigo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan R. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?