Russell v. Anderson
Plaintiff: David T. Russell
Defendant: Edward R. Anderson
Case Number: 4:2017cv03085
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Release of Funds (Filing 188 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall disburse the funds as follows: The Clerk shall pay the $11,601.20 deposited into Court by the defendant, plus any accrued post-judgment interest thereon to "David Russell and The Healy Law Firm" and mailed to: Michael P. Healy THE HEALY LAW FIRM, LLC3640 NE Ralph Powell RoadLee's Summit, Missouri 64064 Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (E-mailed to finance)(LKO)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's request for oral argument (Filing 158 ) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for new trial (Filing 142 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ON FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 3/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (Filing No. 75 ) is denied. The Magistrate Judge's Order entered on July 31, 2018 (Filing No. 72 ), is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply (Filing No. 81 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKO)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's request that the court delay its decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 31 ) under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (F iling No. 31 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: a. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the admitted fact that the Defendant was negligent in crossing the center line on or about August 9, 2013, when Defenda nt was driving his automobile northbound on Highway 281 in Greeley County, Nebraska, while Plaintiff was driving his motorcycle southbound; andb. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to the issues ofwhether Plaintiff failed to mitigate his damages and whether Plaintiffwas negligent in contributing to cause the collision. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKO)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER - Defendant's First Motion for Sanctions (Filing No. 56 ) is denied. Defendant's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 70 ) is granted as set forth above. The pretrial conference and trial are hereby continued. A telephonic status conference will be held on October 5, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. to reschedule the pretrial conference and trial. Telephone conference instructions are found at Filing No. 12 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - Plaintiff shall disclose all medical providers not previously disclosed within five (5) days of this Order. Plaintiff shall provide a certification that the list is full and complete to the best of Plaintiffs knowledge and belief. Plaintiff s hall provide Defendants counsel with the bates numbers of previously produced medical records. Plaintiff shall do so within five (5) days of this Order. Plaintiff shall review his social media accounts and determine what social media information is a vailable for production. Plaintiff shall complete this review within fourteen (14) days of this Order, and confer with Defendants counsel regarding production of this information. Plaintiff shall produce the lien information as requested. The parties indicated that the other issues presented to the Court could be resolved by the parties. Therefore, the parties shall meet and confer to resolve the remaining discovery issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - Christopher Gruber's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff (Filing No. 24 ) is granted. Mr. Gruber shall immediately serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with th is Order, listing the name and address of the person to whom notice was sent. Mr. Gruber will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, Plaintiff, and opposing counsel until proof of service is filed. Upon filing of proof of service pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order, Plaintiff will be deemed to be proceeding pro se, that is, without the assistance of counsel, unless substitute counsel has entered a written appearance on his behalf. If substitute counsel has not entered a written app earance, Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court his current address and telephone number within five days of being served with this Order. Plaintiff may retain substitute counsel at any time. However, until such time as substitute counsel enters a written appearance, Plaintiff must comply with all case progression deadlines, orders of this Court, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. Failure to comply with these requirements may result in the imposition of sa nctions, including payment of costs, attorneys' fees, the entry of default judgment, and/or dismissal of the case. Upon Mr. Gruber's submission of proof of service as described in Paragraph 2 of this Order, Mr. Gruber's appearance as counsel of record for Plaintiff will be terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Anderson
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T. Russell
Represented By: Christopher T. Gruber
Represented By: Andrew J. Nantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?