SouthLaw, PC v. Swanson, et al

Plaintiff: SouthLaw, PC
Defendant: Nancy L. Black, Internal Revenue Service, Neerpark Inc. and Christine L. Swanson
Case Number: 4:2017cv03104
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that SouthLaw, PC has deposited the $731.17 that is the subject of the parties' remaining claims. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that SouthLaw, PC is dismissed as a party to this case. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - After conferring with the parties, this matter will be submitted to the court for ruling as a matter of law as follows: 1) The Internal Revenue service shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 12, 2019. 2) Plaintiff, and Defendants Swanson and Neerpark shall file a statement of their positions on the IRS' motion on or before March 19, 2019. Defendant Black may also file such a statement on or before March 19, 2019. She may also file a separate motion for summary judgment with her requests as to the disposition of the money being held in trust by Plaintiff, such motion to be filed on or before April 2, 2019.3) As stated in the court's local rules, the summary judgment response deadline is 21 days after the motion is filed, with any reply filed seven days thereafter.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB) Modified on 2/12/2019 to reflect copy mailed to pro se party. (JAB)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The telephone conference scheduled for January 10, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. is continued to a date and time yet to be determined. Counsel for the IRS/USA shall contact chambers by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov with in 10 days following the restoration of funding for, and the operation of, the United States Department of Justice. The court will contact the parties to reschedule the telephone conference at that time. A copy of this order shall be mailed to Defendant, Nancy L. Black at her address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed)(TCL)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that Defendant Swanson's motion to stay this case pending the outcome of the Nebraska state court proceedings is granted. Beginning November 1, 2018, Defendant shall file a report on this court's docket which explains the status o f Swanson's state court action. Defendant Swanson shall file a status report on the first of the month every two months thereafter until the stay herein is lifted. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall close this case for statistical purposes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the progression of this case is stayed pending further order of the court. The clerk shall set an August 15, 2018 to re-evaluate whether the case should be progressed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the plaintiff's motion (filing 28 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SouthLaw, PC v. Swanson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neerpark Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine L. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SouthLaw, PC
Represented By: Liliana E. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?