McCullough v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jason McCullough and Jason C. McCullough
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03112
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING LETTER - The court expects the parties to file the completed Form 35 ("Rule 26(f) Report"), including the parties' preferences as to consent, on or before October 18, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jason C. McCullough regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Citibank, N.A. by Citibank, N.A. (Brown, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Jason McCullough from Small Claims Lancaster County Court, Case number SC 18-289 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3744321) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jonathan M. Brown on behalf of Citibank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Brown, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason C. McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Brown
Represented By: Craig A. Knickrehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?