United States of America v. Schunk et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tamera Pickel, Taren Hoffman, Clayton Heinrich, LaRae Schunk, Nebraska Department of Revenue and Ronald Heinrich
Case Number: 4:2018cv03117
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Clayton Heinrich. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 Disclaimer ANSWER to Complaint Disclaimer by Nebraska Department of Revenue (Coulter, Amber)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon (Coulter, Amber)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Tamera Pickel. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018; LaRae Schunk. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Ronald Heinrich. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018; Taren Hoffman. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, by Attorney Martin M. Shoemaker on behalf of United States of America(Shoemaker, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schunk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamera Pickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taren Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaRae Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Revenue
Represented By: Amber L. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Heinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Martin M. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?