PMI Nebraska, LLC v. Nordhues et al
Plaintiff: PMI Nebraska LLC and PMI Nebraska, LLC
Defendant: Colin McClure
3Rd Party Plaintiff: David Nordhues, Chris Golick and Precision Ag Construction, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv03126
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the parties' joint motion (filing #22 ) to strike the defendants' third-party complaint (filing #7 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to strike the defendants' third-party complaint (filing #7 ). The plaintiffs' motion to strike (filing #14 ) is denied as moot. The parties' joint motion to extend (filing #21 ) is granted. The defendants may respond to the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (filing #18 ) on or before November 16, 2018. The plaintiff may reply in support of its motion for preliminary injunction (filing #18 ) on or before November 26, 2018. The counterclaim defendants may respond to the amended counterclaim (filing #20 ) on or before November 19, 2018. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
October 15, 2018 Filing 22 JOINT MOTION to Strike Third Party Complaint #7 and Recognize Defendants' Answer and Amended Counterclaim as Defendants' Operative Pleading by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC.(Gerdes, Torrey)
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Stay by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC.(Gerdes, Torrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM with jury demand against Colin McClure, PMI Nebraska, LLC regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC, Chris Golick by Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC (Gerdes, Torrey)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 BRIEF in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff PMI Nebraska, LLC.(Hansen, Tanya)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff PMI Nebraska, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Evidence, #2 Affidavit Colin McClure, #3 Affidavit Gary Sondgeroth)(Hansen, Tanya)
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 INDEX in support of Brief #16 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Torrey J. Gerdes)(Gerdes, Torrey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Change Place of Trial #10 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC.(Gerdes, Torrey)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Third-Party Complaint by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff PMI Nebraska, LLC.(Hansen, Tanya)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike Third-Party Complaint by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff PMI Nebraska, LLC.(Hansen, Tanya)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Counterclaim by PMI Nebraska, LLC (Hansen, Tanya)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff PMI Nebraska, LLC.(Hansen, Tanya)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendants Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC.(Gerdes, Torrey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Place of Trial by Attorney Tanya J. Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff PMI Nebraska, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Evidence, #2 Affidavit of Tanya J. Hansen)(Hansen, Tanya)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to third party defendant Colin McClure. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Colin McClure regarding Third Party Complaint #7 . (Gerdes, Torrey)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 STRICKEN - THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Colin McClure, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC(Gerdes, Torrey) Modified on 10/15/2018 to strike per Order #23 (LAC).
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against PMI Nebraska, LLC regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC, Chris Golick by Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC (Gerdes, Torrey)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Court will not consider motions pending and undecided in state court at the time of removal, and any request from the plaintiff for preliminary injunctive relief should be filed in federal court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a). Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff PMI Nebraska LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Precision Ag Construction, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against PMI Nebraska LLC from District Court of Hall County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18 - 676 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3759451) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Chris Golick, David Nordhues, Precision Ag Construction, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gerdes, Torrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PMI Nebraska, LLC v. Nordhues et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMI Nebraska LLC
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMI Nebraska, LLC
Represented By: Tanya J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: David Nordhues
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Chris Golick
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Precision Ag Construction, LLC
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?