Perry v. Zoetis LLC

Plaintiff: Barbara Perry
Defendant: Zoetis LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv03128
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 BRIEF (Reply) in Support of Motion to Remand and Certificate of Service by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Perry.(Neary, Kathleen)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to October 23, 2018, to file a brief in Reply to the Motion to Remand #8 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading /Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Attorney Vincent M. Powers on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Perry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Vincent)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Stay. The deadline for the parties to file their Rule 26(f) Report is extended to 14-days after the assigned district judge rules on the magistrate judge's Findings and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #8 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION to Stay regarding Scheduling Letter #7 Deadline to file 26(f) Report by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendant Zoetis LLC.(Wentz, Kenneth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand and Certificate of Service #8 by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendant Zoetis LLC.(Wentz, Kenneth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Zoetis, Inc., Corporate Parent Zoetis Holdings L.L.C. for Zoetis LLC. by Attorney Caitlin Ellis on behalf of Defendants Zoetis LLC, Zoetis Holdings L.L.C., Zoetis, Inc..(Ellis, Caitlin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Certificate of Service by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Perry.(Neary, Kathleen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Certificate of Service by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Barbara Perry.(Neary, Kathleen)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING LETTER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/18/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (CCB)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Zoetis LLC (Ellis, Caitlin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Caitlin Ellis on behalf of Defendant Zoetis LLC (Ellis, Caitlin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendant Zoetis LLC (Wentz, Kenneth)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Zoetis LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand and Exhibits A-E against Barbara Perry from Lancaster county District Court, Case number CI 18-2646 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3760717) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Zoetis LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A State Crt Complaint, Ex B return of Service, Ex C fist Am. complaint, Ex D Declaration of Brenda Santuccio, Ex E Remainder of State Crt file)(Wentz, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Zoetis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoetis LLC
Represented By: Caitlin Ellis
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Perry
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?