Lackas v. Madison County School District 0002

Plaintiff: Donna Lackas
Defendant: Madison County School District 0002
Case Number: 4:2018cv03155
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Depositions due 9/16/19. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Status Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (TCL) Modified on 12/21/2018 to remove docket text (TCL).
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Madison County School District 0002.(Gerdes, Torrey)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Plaintiff by Madison County School District 0002 (Gerdes, Torrey)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. On or before November 29, 2018, Defendant Madison County School District 0002 shall file its answer or response to Plaintiff's complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Answer Deadline by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Defendant Madison County School District 0002.(Gerdes, Torrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (LKO)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Donna Lackas from District Court of Madison County, Nebraska, Case number CI 18-428 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3800248) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Torrey J. Gerdes on behalf of Madison County School District 0002 d/b/a Norfolk Public Schools (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gerdes, Torrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackas v. Madison County School District 0002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lackas
Represented By: Thomas P. McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County School District 0002
Represented By: Torrey J. Gerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?