Longs v. Lincoln Police Officer Groves et al

Plaintiff: Michael J. Longs, II
Defendant: Laura Lowe and Lincoln Police Officer Groves
Case Number: 4:2019cv03001
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Pro Se Docket
1 Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion for an extension (filing no. #11 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case is for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business and will address Plaintiff's other pending motion at that time. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
March 7, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Michael J. Longs, II on 03/07/2019. Receipt number 8050972, in the amount of $ 5.56. (LAC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Payment on behalf of Plaintiff Michael J. Longs, II. (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Michael J. Longs, II. (CS)
February 7, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Michael Longs on 2/7/19. Receipt number 8050602, in the amount of $ 4.80. (ADB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Filing on behalf of Plaintiff Michael J. Longs, II. (LKO)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #5 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.80 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerks office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 28, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution) (LKO)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Michael J. Longs, II. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy of Letter sent to Angie Kozel at Lancaster County Corrections. (LKO)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Michael J. Longs, II. (LKO)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 11, 2019: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Police Officer Groves and Laura Lowe filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Michael J. Longs, II. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longs v. Lincoln Police Officer Groves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Longs, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Police Officer Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?