Lundahl v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Holli Lundahl
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv03010
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
2 Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Brian J. Fahey on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fahey, Brian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Notice of Appearance #11 by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance (Corrected) by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Coyle, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Coyle, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Holli Lundahl has requested electronic filing rights in this case. Because of the Order of Referral to the United States Attorney, see, e.g., filing no. 53 in 8:16CV368, this case has been stayed and Plaintiff's request is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party at address listed in the notice of removal and to P.O. Box 105, Hot Springs, SD 57747, which is the address listed in plaintiff's request for e-filing rights submitted through Pacer) (KMG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Lewis P. Perling on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Perling, Lewis)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Because of the Order of Referral to the United States Attorney, see, e.g., filing no. 53 in 8:16CV368, this case is stayed until further order of the undersigned. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Transunion LLC. by Attorney Randall L. Goyette on behalf of Defendants Transunion LLC, TransUnion, TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc..(Goyette, Randall)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for judicial supervision and disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Transunion LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand (Amended, with attachments) against Holli Lundahl from Scottsbluff County District Court, Case number CI 19-40 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Randall L. Goyette on behalf of Transunion LLC(Goyette, Randall)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Trans Union, LLC's Request for Place of Trial by Attorney Randall L. Goyette on behalf of Defendant Transunion LLC (Goyette, Randall)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Holli Lundahl from Scotts Bluff County District Court, Case number CI 19-40 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3862562) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Randall L. Goyette on behalf of Transunion LLC(Goyette, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundahl v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Lewis P. Perling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Fahey
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Randall L. Goyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holli Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?