Perez v. Noah's Ark Processors, LLC
Petitioner: Leonard J. Perez
Respondent: Noah's Ark Processors, LLC
Interested Party: United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293
Case Number: 4:2019cv03016
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 160 (1) National Labor Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Hearing regarding Complaint #1 Motion for Oral Argument by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to Brief #13 by Attorney Jerry L. Pigsley on behalf of Respondent Noah's Ark Processors, LLC.(Pigsley, Jerry)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Board Hearing Transcript 5 of 5 with Exhibits by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GC Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibit GC Exhibits 6-33, #3 Exhibit Respondent Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Joint Exhibits)(LeMaster, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Board Hearing Transcript 4 of 5 by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Board Hearing Transcript 3 of 5 by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Board Hearing Transcript 2 of 5 by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Board Hearing Transcript 1 of 5 by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of Supplemental Brief Summarizing Board Proceedings by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - As soon as is practicable, the plaintiff shall provide the Court with the administrative record from the NLRB hearing scheduled to begin on March 18, 2019, along with any additional evidence the plaintiff believes relevant to the Court's determination on injunctive relief. Upon filing the administrative record, the plaintiff shall also file a supplementary brief summarizing the NLRB proceedings, and addressing any additional issues arising out of those proceedings. Within 7 days of the filing of the administrative record and plaintiff's brief, the defendant may file a brief in response and any additional evidence the defendant believes relevant to the Court's determination on injunctive relief, at which time the matter will be resubmitted. The parties may seek extension or modification of this schedule by appropriate motion. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in opposition to Brief #8 with request for expedited consideration by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate SJK Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Total Corporate Resources II, LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Elliott, Trustee, Other Affiliate Ephraim Bulow for Noah's Ark Processors, LLC. by Attorney Jerry L. Pigsley on behalf of Respondents Noah's Ark Processors, LLC, SJK Ventures, LLC, Total Corporate Resources II, LLC, Robert Elliott, Trustee, Ephraim Bulow.(Pigsley, Jerry)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Respondent Noah's Ark Processors, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in opposition to Complaint #1 by Attorney Jerry L. Pigsley on behalf of Respondent Noah's Ark Processors, LLC.(Pigsley, Jerry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Frederick Zarate on behalf of Interested Party United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293 (Zarate, Frederick)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's request for injunctive relief with a brief and index of supporting evidence (if any), on or before March 4, 2019. The plaintiff may reply in support of its request for injunctive relief on or before March 7, 2019, or may waive reply, at which time the matter will be submitted. At or before the time the matter is submitted, the plaintiff shall provide the Court with a proposed order as provided by NECivR 7.2. The Clerk of the Court shall provide a copy of this order, by email, to Jerry Pigsley < and Frederick Zarate <. The plaintiff shall promptly serve the defendant with a copy of this order as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KMM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Hearing regarding Complaint #1 with request for expedited consideration by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 INDEX in support of Complaint #1 with request for expedited consideration by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF in support of Complaint #1 with request for expedited consideration by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Petitioner Leonard J. Perez.(LeMaster, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with request for expedited consideration against Noah's Ark Processors, LLC, by Attorney William F. LeMaster on behalf of Leonard J. Perez(LeMaster, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Noah's Ark Processors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Noah's Ark Processors, LLC
Represented By: Jerry L. Pigsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293
Represented By: Frederick Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonard J. Perez
Represented By: William F. LeMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?