Buttercase v. Kopf et al
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Buttercase
Defendant: Erin E. Tangeman and Richard G. Kopf
Case Number: 4:2019cv03040
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
2 Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph J. Buttercase.(LAC)
June 21, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Joseph J. Buttercase on 06/21/2019. Receipt number 8052325, in the amount of $3.04. (KLF)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.04 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 8, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Court to Take Judicial Notice on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph J. Buttercase. (LAC)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to the pro se docket for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk's office shall randomly assign a new judge to this case and request a reassignment order from the Chief Judge. The chief pro se staff attorney will assist the judge to whom the case is reassigned if requested to do so. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT/CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Joseph J. Buttercase. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (SLP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (SLP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph J. Buttercase. (SLP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Richard G. Kopf, Erin E. Tangeman filed on behalf of Joseph J. Buttercase. (SLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buttercase v. Kopf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Buttercase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin E. Tangeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Kopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?