Vercellino v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Vercellino
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., Ameritas Holding Company Health Plan, Optum Insight, Inc. and Board of Trustees of Ameritas Holding Company Health Plan
Intervenor Plaintiff: Connor Kenney
Case Number: 4:2019cv03048
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Defendant by Nathan Vercellino (Powers, Vincent)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Intervene #19 by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Connor Kenney.(Stryker, Leslie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Connor Kenney.(Stryker, Leslie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent United Healthgroup, Inc., Corporate Parent United Healthgroup, Inc. for Optum Insight, Inc., Optum Insight, Inc.. by Attorney Noah G. Lipschultz on behalf of Defendants Optum Insight, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc., Counter Claimants Optum Insight, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent United Healthgroup, Inc., Corporate Parent United Healthgroup, Inc. for United HealthCare Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc.. by Attorney Noah G. Lipschultz on behalf of Defendants United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc., Counter Claimants United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc., United Healthgroup, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #14 AFFIRMATIVE AND OTHER DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIM OF AMERITAS HOLDING COMPANY against Nathan Vercellino regarding Amended Complaint #14 filed by Nathan Vercellino by Optum Insight, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., Ameritas Holding Company Health Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lipschultz, Noah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Amended Complaint #13 is stricken for the following reason(s): the document is an unsigned duplicate of document number #14 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Vincent M. Powers on behalf of Nathan Vercellino(Powers, Vincent)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN - AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Vincent M. Powers on behalf of Nathan Vercellino(Powers, Vincent) Modified on 6/21/2019 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 15 . (JAB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Vincent M. Powers on behalf of Nathan Vercellino(Powers, Vincent)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint Stipulation to File Amended Complaint and for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. #10 . IT IS ORDERED:1. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before June 19, 2019.2. Defendants shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint on or before July 10, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Attorney Noah G. Lipschultz on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Noah Lipschultz. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Noah G. Lipschultz Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3944281 by Attorney Noah G. Lipschultz on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc..(Lipschultz, Noah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Noah G. Lipschultz has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jeannie M. DeVeney has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Attorney Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(DeVeney, Jeannie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Nathan Vercellino from Lancaster County, Case number CI-19-1229 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3944062) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Optum Services, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vercellino v. Optum Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameritas Holding Company Health Plan
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Insight, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Ameritas Holding Company Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Vercellino
Represented By: Vincent M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Connor Kenney
Represented By: Leslie S. Stryker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?