Jerabek v. Perdue et al

Plaintiff: Lisa J. Jerabek
Defendant: Sonny Perdue and Howard-Greeley Farm Service Agency
Case Number: 4:2019cv03049
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sonny Perdue on 6/3/2019. (Schroeder, Erin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sonny Perdue on 5/31/2019. (Schroeder, Erin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Howard-Greeley Farm Service Agency on 5/31/2019. (Schroeder, Erin)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Sonny Perdue. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Howard-Greeley Farm Service Agency. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to SONNY PERDUE and HOWARD-GREELEY FARM SERVICE AGENCY regarding Complaint #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Sonny, #2 Summons - Sonny)(Schroeder, Erin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #3 . Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is refunded to the payor, Erin E. Schroeder, receipt number ANEDC-3944175. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Refund of filing fee paid electronically by Attorney Erin E. Schroeder on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa J. Jerabek.(Schroeder, Erin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3944181), by Attorney Erin E. Schroeder on behalf of Lisa J. Jerabek(Schroeder, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerabek v. Perdue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard-Greeley Farm Service Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa J. Jerabek
Represented By: Erin E. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?