Veenendaal v. Lancaster County School District 0001
Plaintiff: Rachel Veenendaal
Defendant: Lancaster County School District 0001 and Lincoln Public Schools
Case Number: 4:2019cv03069
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is July 10, 2020. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Cheryl R. Zwart, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on November 2, 2020, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on October 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The parties requested an interim status conference which will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on December 10, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The parties indicate their intention to mediate on February 21, 2020. A telephonic conference to discuss the outcome of mediation will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Joshua J. Schauer on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County School District 0001.(Schauer, Joshua)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint email motion to extend the Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline to August 23, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER A Telephone Conference is set for August 15, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties shall use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (Filing No. 5). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.(CEW)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Lancaster County School District 0001 (Perry, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Rachel Veenendaal from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-1840 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3974481) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Gregory H. Perry on behalf of Lancaster County School District 0001 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, Praecipe and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Mail Proof of Service)(Perry, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veenendaal v. Lancaster County School District 0001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County School District 0001
Represented By: Joshua J. Schauer
Represented By: Haleigh B. Carlson
Represented By: Gregory H. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Public Schools
Represented By: Joshua J. Schauer
Represented By: Haleigh B. Carlson
Represented By: Gregory H. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Veenendaal
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?