Schottel v. Nebraska State College System
Plaintiff: Ronicka Schottel
Defendant: Nebraska State College System
Case Number: 4:2019cv03071
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/10/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Nebraska State College System (Martin, George)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 9, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney George E. Martin, III on behalf of Defendant Nebraska State College System.(Martin, George)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nebraska State College System on 7/18/2019. (Hamilton, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Nebraska State College System. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Nebraska State College System regarding Complaint #1 . (Hamilton, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3979279), by Attorney James D. Hamilton on behalf of Ronicka Schottel(Hamilton, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schottel v. Nebraska State College System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State College System
Represented By: George E. Martin, III
Represented By: David P. Kennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronicka Schottel
Represented By: James D. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?