Sutton v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Ph.D Pamela Sutton and Pamela J. Sutton
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv03082
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (KLF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (KLF)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Change Place of Trial #9 by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Plaintiff Pamela J. Sutton.(Domina, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Place of Trial by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Plaintiff Pamela J. Sutton.(Domina, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 INDEX in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Location by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Plaintiff Pamela J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David A. Domina)(Domina, David)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/16/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO Request Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael) Modified on 8/16/2019 to reflect motion per CRZ chambers (LKO).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Monsanto Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KMM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Monsanto Company from Lancaster County District Court, Case number 19-2205 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3997043) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Huffer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ph.D Pamela Sutton
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Sutton
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?