Palmer v. KCI USA, INC.
Plaintiff: Catherine Palmer
Defendant: KCI USA, INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03084
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0251
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #20 for attorney Eric L. Zalud. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Eric Larson Zalud Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4037734 by Attorney Eric L. Zalud on behalf of Defendant KCI USA, INC..(Zalud, Eric)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #16 for attorney David Krueger. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #17 for attorney Anthony Sallah. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Sallah Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BNEDC-4035923 by Attorney Anthony Sallah on behalf of Defendant KCI USA, INC..(Sallah, Anthony)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Krueger Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4035914 by Attorney David Krueger on behalf of Defendant KCI USA, INC..(Krueger, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David Krueger has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Eric L. Zalud has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Anthony Sallah has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Thomas O. Crist has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KMM)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent KCI Licensing, Inc. for KCI USA, INC.. by Attorney Craig A. Knickrehm on behalf of Defendants KCI USA, INC., KCI Licensing, Inc..(Knickrehm, Craig)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant KCI USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by KCI USA, INC. (Knickrehm, Craig)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant KCI USA, INC. on 9/17/2019. (Radbil, Aaron)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Palmer (Klinger, Gary)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant KCI USA, INC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gary M. Klinger has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to KCI USA, INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Radbil, Aaron)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against KCI USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNEDC-3999668), by Attorney Aaron D. Radbil on behalf of Catherine Palmer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radbil, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. KCI USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCI USA, INC.
Represented By: Craig A. Knickrehm
Represented By: Anthony Sallah
Represented By: Jonathan M. Brown
Represented By: Thomas O. Crist
Represented By: Eric L. Zalud
Represented By: David Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Palmer
Represented By: Aaron D. Radbil
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?