Henderson State Bank v. Wibbels et al

Plaintiff: Henderson State Bank
Defendant: Shane M. Wibbels and Jessica H. Wibbels
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Garnishee: Landmark Water
Case Number: 4:2019cv03086
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Affidavit and Request for Summons in Garnishment (In Aid of Execution) by Attorney Justin J. Knight on behalf of Plaintiff Henderson State Bank.(Knight, Justin)
February 24, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment on behalf of Garnishee Landmark Water. (JSF)
February 18, 2015 Filing 6 RETURN of service of Summons and Order of Garnishment on 02/12/2015 upon Landmark Water by Attorney John M. Guthery, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Henderson State Bank.(Guthery, John)
February 10, 2015 Filing 5 Summons and Order of Garnishment, with attachments, issued to Garnishee Landmark Water. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (NMW)
January 15, 2015 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to cmaser@abswebb.net regarding MOTION Affidavit and Praecipe for Summons in Garnishment #3 . E-mail resent to ambm921@gmail.com. (JSF)
January 14, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION Affidavit and Praecipe for Summons in Garnishment by Attorney Justin J. Knight on behalf of Plaintiff Henderson State Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Garnishment Documents)(Knight, Justin)
October 30, 2012 Filing 2 Transmittal Letter with attached docket sheet(s) from USBC-Nebraska, (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet for BK12-42674, #2 Docket Sheet for A12-4002) (AOA)
October 30, 2012 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Judgment from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Nebraska in the amount of $1,794,530 against defendant Shane M. Wibbels and in favor of Henderson State Bank. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson State Bank v. Wibbels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane M. Wibbels
Represented By: Charles R. Maser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica H. Wibbels
Represented By: Charles R. Maser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Landmark Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henderson State Bank
Represented By: John M. Guthery, Jr.
Represented By: Justin J. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?