Goodwin v. N.D.C.S. Medical et al
Plaintiff: Brandon A. Goodwin
Defendant: Keith P. Hughes, Southwest Lincoln Surgery Center and N.D.C.S. Medical
Case Number: 4:2019cv03114
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's correspondence, construed as a Motion for Extension of Time #10 , is granted. Plaintiff shall have until February 28, 2020, to pay his initial partial filing fee. The clerk's office is directed to set the following case management deadline: February 28, 2020: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION For An Extension on behalf of Plaintiff Brandon A. Goodwin.(TCL)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $12.83 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 29, 2020: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Brandon A. Goodwin.(ADB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Brandon A. Goodwin. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (ADB)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (ADB)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (ADB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Brandon A. Goodwin. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (ADB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Brandon A. Goodwin. (ADB)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Keith P. Hughes, N.D.C.S. Medical, Southwest Lincoln Surgery Center; no Summons(es) issued; filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Brandon A. Goodwin. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. N.D.C.S. Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith P. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Lincoln Surgery Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.D.C.S. Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon A. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?