Robert Parker v. Olsson, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Parker
Defendant: Olsson, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03071
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent OEI, Inc. for Olsson, Inc.. by Attorney Erin Ebeler Rolf on behalf of Defendants Olsson, Inc., OEI, Inc..(Ebeler Rolf, Erin)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued to August 21, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Erin Ebeler Rolf on behalf of Defendant Olsson, Inc..(Ebeler Rolf, Erin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Olsson, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Robert Parker from District Court of Lancaster County, Case number CI 20-1739 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4181055) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Erin Ebeler Rolf on behalf of Olsson, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Ebeler Rolf, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Parker v. Olsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olsson, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela J. Bourne
Represented By: Erin Ebeler Rolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Parker
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?