Speedway Motors, Inc. v. Strong
Plaintiff: Speedway Motors, Inc.
Defendant: Maria Strong
Case Number: 4:2020cv03089
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon those designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of defendant and defendant Maria Strong on 8/11/2020. (Hartz, Blake)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT on the complaint filed on 08/03/2020 of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 ). (LRM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Charles J. Meyer. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Blake R. Hartz. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4210306 by Attorney Charles J. Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff Speedway Motors, Inc..(Meyer, Charles)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4210297 by Attorney Blake R. Hartz on behalf of Plaintiff Speedway Motors, Inc..(Hartz, Blake)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Maria Strong. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Blake R. Hartz has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Charles J. Meyer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Maria Strong regarding Complaint #1 . (Luebbert, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Elizabeth A. Luebbert on behalf of Plaintiff Speedway Motors, Inc..(Luebbert, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maria Strong ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4209787), by Attorney Elizabeth A. Luebbert on behalf of Speedway Motors, Inc.(Luebbert, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speedway Motors, Inc. v. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speedway Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Luebbert
Represented By: Charles J. Meyer
Represented By: Gregory C. Scaglione
Represented By: Blake R. Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?