Midwest Agronomy, LLC v. Ag-Co Chemical, LLC
Plaintiff: Midwest Agronomy, LLC
Defendant: Ag-Co Chemical, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03110
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend. The plaintiff may respond to the defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 on or before December 4, 2020. The defendant may reply in support of its motion on or before December 11, 2020. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to Ag-Co Chemical, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC.(Buter, Victoria)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 INDEX in support of Brief #10 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Z. Shamburger)(Tanner, Trenton)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC.(Buter, Victoria)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 23, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-2875 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4238197) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Ag-Co Chemical, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tanner, Trenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Agronomy, LLC v. Ag-Co Chemical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Agronomy, LLC
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Mattea Fosbender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ag-Co Chemical, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Represented By: Trenton D. Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?