Ramos v. Farmers Insurance
Plaintiff: Vaneza Ramos
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Case Number: 4:2020cv03148
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Thomas O. Campbell on behalf of Plaintiff Vaneza Ramos.(Campbell, Thomas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The service or attempted service on Michael Powers of the summons issued for this case by the District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska is stricken: Michael Powers has never been a party to this action. Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before February 8, 2021, they shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) Report, a copy of which can be found at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms. Unless the parties agree otherwise, Plaintiff(s) shall prepare the initial draft of the Report and then forward it to Defendant(s) for further additions or revisions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Farmers Insurance (Rawl, A.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (MLF)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Farmers Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Company Ltd. for Farmers Insurance. by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Farmers Insurance, Farmers Group, Inc., Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Zurich Company Ltd., Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd..(Rawl, A.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Vaneza Ramos from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-8296 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4292143 - $2, receipt #4007941) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Farmers Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Rawl, A.) Modified on 12/14/2020 to reflect total filing fee amount of $402 receipted (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Farmers Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Represented By: Mandy M. Gruhlkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaneza Ramos
Represented By: Thomas O. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?