Sampson Construction Co., Inc. v. Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Sampson Construction Co., Inc.
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03149
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is December 31, 2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on July 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER CANCELLING HEARING: The planning conference set for January 19, 2021 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned magistrate judge is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephonic planning conference is set for January 19, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Anthony L. Osborn on behalf of Plaintiff Sampson Construction Co., Inc..(Osborn, Anthony)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (MKR)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Shane C. Mecham on behalf of Defendant Developers Surety and Indemnity Company.(Mecham, Shane)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - CONSENT Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/7/2021. Consent Deadline set for 1/11/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Jury Trial Requested by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company (Mecham, Shane)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Sampson Construction Co., Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Shane C. Mecham on behalf of Defendant Developers Surety and Indemnity Company.(Mecham, Shane)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Sampson Construction Co., Inc. from District Court of Lancaster County, Case number D02CI200001945 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4292273 - $2, Receipt #4007942) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Shane C. Mecham on behalf of Developers Surety and Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Lancaster County Filings-Petition and Summons, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Jason Leiker)(Mecham, Shane) Modified on 12/14/2020 to reflect total filing fee amount of $402 receipted (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson Construction Co., Inc. v. Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Shane C. Mecham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sampson Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Graff
Represented By: Anthony L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?