Dohrman v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bailey Dohrman
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. and Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03037
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #13 by Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC (Watts, Patrick)
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #13 by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC, by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Bailey Dohrman(Robertson, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick Watts on behalf of Defendant Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC.(Watts, Patrick)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Account Control Technology Holdings, Inc. for Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. by Attorney Patrick Watts on behalf of Defendants Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Account Control Technology Holdings, Inc..(Watts, Patrick)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Patrick Watts on behalf of Defendants Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC (Watts, Patrick)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Bailey Dohrman.(Stecklein, Alan)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Alan J. Stecklein on behalf of Plaintiff Bailey Dohrman (Stecklein, Alan)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew S. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff Bailey Dohrman (Robertson, Matthew)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael H. Rapp on behalf of Plaintiff Bailey Dohrman (Rapp, Michael)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to March 18, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendants Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Bailey Dohrman from Lancaster County District Court, Case number CI 21 190 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4340386) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dohrman v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Patrick Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Patrick Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailey Dohrman
Represented By: Tregg R. Lunn
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?