Melendez v. City of Grand Island et al
Plaintiff: Sonia Melendez
Defendant: 911 Dispatcher #2, Hall County, Nebraska, City of Grand Island, 911 Dispatcher #1, DOES #1 - 10 and Jon Rosenlund
Case Number: 4:2021cv03061
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss Party. Hall County, Nebraska (a Nebraska political subdivision) is dismissed without prejudice and terminated as a party. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
May 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Party Hall County, Nebraska, a Nebraska political subdivision Without Prejudice by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Plaintiff Sonia Melendez.(Chaloupka, Maren)
May 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jon Rosenlund on 4/22/2021. (Chaloupka, Maren)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Hall County, Nebraska on 4/17/2021. (Chaloupka, Maren)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City of Grand Island on 4/19/2021. (Chaloupka, Maren)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to defendant City of Grand Island, Hall County, Nebraska, Jon Rosenlund. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Hall County, Nebraska regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Chaloupka, Maren)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to City of Grand Island regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Chaloupka, Maren)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Jon Rosenlund regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Chaloupka, Maren)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand (Second Amended) against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Sonia Melendez(Chaloupka, Maren)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Restrict. Access to Filing Nos. 1 and 3 shall be restricted to case participants and the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION to Restrict Access by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Plaintiff Sonia Melendez.(Chaloupka, Maren)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER denying #4 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff has requested that the Complaint and Amended Complaint be sealed, and that access to those documents be limited to the parties and the Court. The Court construes this motion as one to restrict access to the documents. The motion does not, however, state a basis for the relief sought. Therefore, it will be denied at this time. Counsel may file an amended motion which includes the basis for relief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to file under Seal by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Plaintiff Sonia Melendez.(Chaloupka, Maren)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 RESTRICTED AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Sonia Melendez(Chaloupka, Maren) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Modified on 4/8/2021 to add restricted language pursuant to order 7 (CS).
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 RESTRICTED COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4357348), by Attorney Maren L. Chaloupka on behalf of Sonia Melendez(Chaloupka, Maren) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Modified on 4/8/2021 to add restricted language pursuant to order 7 (CS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez v. City of Grand Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 911 Dispatcher #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Grand Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 911 Dispatcher #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES #1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Rosenlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Melendez
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?