Lundberg v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Andrea L Lundberg and Andrea Lundberg
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv03120
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Andrew Saul, Kilolo Kijakazi, Merrick B. Garland, Jan W. Sharp defendant All Defendants. (Mangiameli, Ann)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Defendant's motion to substitute party (Filing #12 ) is granted. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, is hereby substituted for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner, Social Security Administration, as Defendant in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to conform the docket accordingly. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Steven A. Russell on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul.(Russell, Steven)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew Saul, US Attorney for the District of Nebraska, and US Attorney General. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Merrick Garland, Jan W. Sharp regarding Complaint #1 . (Mangiameli, Ann)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Jan W. sharp, Andrew Saul, Merrick Garland regarding Complaint #1 . (Mangiameli, Ann)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant All Defendants. (Mangiameli, Ann)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney's Office, and U.S. Attorney General. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (SLP)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee; and The Clerk of the Court shall issue summonses as requested by Plaintiff (Filing 5). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SLP)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Merrick Garland, Jan W. Sharp regarding Complaint #1 . (Mangiameli, Ann)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LRM)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Attorney Ann C. Mangiameli on behalf of Plaintiff Andrea L Lundberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of Plaintiff, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mangiameli, Ann)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, by Attorney Ann C. Mangiameli on behalf of Andrea L Lundberg(Mangiameli, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundberg v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea L Lundberg
Represented By: Ann C. Mangiameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Lundberg
Represented By: Ann C. Mangiameli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven A. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Steven A. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?