Tyler v. Horatio et al
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler
Defendant: Wheelock Horatio, Kayla and Clerk Supreme Court Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2021cv03177
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Billy Tyler at 1451 Emmet Street, Omaha, NE 68110 regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #2 and Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01 #3 . Mail not resent, no forwarding address. (LKO)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Billy Tyler at 1451 Emmet Street, Omaha, NE 68110 regarding Memorandum and Order #6 . Mail not resent, no forwarding address. (LKO)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must update his address by October 27, 2021. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 27, 2021: update of Plaintiff's address due; if none, dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Billy Tyler at 1451 Emmet Street, Omaha, NE 68110 regarding Order #4 . Mail not resent, no forwarding address. (LKO)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $402.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: October 14, 2021: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clerk Supreme Court Nebraska, Wheelock Horatio, and Kayla filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Billy Tyler. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Horatio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheelock Horatio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk Supreme Court Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?