Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln et al v. Kenney et al
Plaintiff: Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln, Zachary Thompson, Holly Fischer, William Johnson and Elena Thomson
Defendant: Paul Kenney, Bob Phares, Timothy Clare, Jack Stark, Jim Pillen, Elizabeth O'Connor, Robert Schafer, Barbara Weitz, Ted Carter, Jr., Ronnie Green, Laurie Bellows, Association of Students of the University of Nebraska at Lincoln, The University Program Council and Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2021cv03301
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Association of Students of the University of Nebraska at Lincoln on 11/8/2021; Laurie Bellows on 11/8/2021; Ted Carter, Jr. on 11/8/2021; Timothy Clare on 11/8/2021; Ronnie Green on 11/8/2021; Paul Kenney on 11/8/2021; Elizabeth O'Connor on 11/8/2021; Bob Phares on 11/8/2021; Jim Pillen on 11/8/2021; Robert Schafer on 11/8/2021; Jack Stark on 11/8/2021; The University Program Council on 11/8/2021; Barbara Weitz on 11/8/2021. (Ross, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by January 7, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Answer Date by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska.(Barry, Andre)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #8 for attorney Jonathan C. Dalton. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #10 for attorney Greggory R. Walters. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #9 for attorney Michael R. Ross. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4509406 by Attorney Greggory R. Walters on behalf of Plaintiffs Holly Fischer, William Johnson, Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln, Zachary Thompson, Elena Thomson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walters, Greggory)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BNEDC-4509375 by Attorney Michael R. Ross on behalf of Plaintiffs Holly Fischer, William Johnson, Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln, Zachary Thompson, Elena Thomson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Michael)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4509351 by Attorney Jonathan C. Dalton on behalf of Plaintiffs Holly Fischer, William Johnson, Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln, Zachary Thompson, Elena Thomson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dalton, Jonathan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Association of Students of the University of Nebraska at Lincoln, Laurie Bellows, Ted Carter, Jr., Timothy Clare, Ronnie Green, Paul Kenney, Elizabeth O'Connor, Bob Phares, Jim Pillen, Robert Schafer, Jack Stark, The University Program Council, and Barbara Weitz. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael R. Ross has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney J. Caleb Dalton has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Greggory R. Walters has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to All Defendants regarding Complaint,, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons of Bob Phares, #2 Summons of Timothy Clare, #3 Summons of Jack Stark, #4 Summons of Jim Pillen, #5 Summons of Elizabeth O'Connor, #6 Summons of Robert Schafer, #7 Summons of Barbara Weitz, #8 Summons of Ted Carter Jr., #9 Summons of Ronnie Green, #10 Summons of Laurie Bellows, #11 Summons of Association of Students of the University of Nebraska at Lincoln, #12 Summons of The University Program Council)(Wall, Richard)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4508001), by Attorney Richard J. Wall, Jr on behalf of William Johnson, Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln, Zachary Thompson, Elena Thomson, Holly Fischer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Wall, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln et al v. Kenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ratio Christi at the University of Nebraska-Lincoln
Represented By: Richard J. Wall, Jr
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dalton
Represented By: Michael R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Thompson
Represented By: Richard J. Wall, Jr
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dalton
Represented By: Michael R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Fischer
Represented By: Richard J. Wall, Jr
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dalton
Represented By: Michael R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Johnson
Represented By: Richard J. Wall, Jr
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dalton
Represented By: Michael R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Thomson
Represented By: Richard J. Wall, Jr
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dalton
Represented By: Michael R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Phares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Pillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Bellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Students of the University of Nebraska at Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University Program Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?