Timpte Industries, Inc. v. Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timpte Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc. and Peterson Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv03058
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the defendant's #10 Motion to Transfer to the District of U.S. District Court -Colorado. The Clerk of the Court shall immediately effect transfer of this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's operative complaint within 14 days of the District of Colorado's opening of the case and assignment of a docket number. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendants Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc., Peterson Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Keith, Robert)
April 29, 2022 Case transferred to District of Colorado. Original electronic file sent. (MKR)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Timpte Industries, Inc. for Timpte Industries, Inc.. by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Plaintiffs Timpte Industries, Inc., Timpte Industries, Inc..(Barry, Andre)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Timpte Industries, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to May 2, 2022, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the amended complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Amended Complaint) by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendants Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc., Peterson Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keith, Robert)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Beau B. Bump has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendant Peterson Manufacturing Company.(Keith, Robert)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Timpte Industries, Inc. from District Court of Butler County, NE, Case number CI 22-11 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4612940) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Peterson Manufacturing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings)(Keith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timpte Industries, Inc. v. Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timpte Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Represented By: Beau B. Bump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi-Seal Harness Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?