Carlson v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Carlson
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03184
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 18 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Nelnet Servicing, LLC shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before December 15, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
October 24, 2022 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney James Monagle. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4736917 by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Claudia D. McCarron. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 20, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4736765 by Attorney Claudia D. McCarron on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(McCarron, Claudia)
October 18, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Waiver sent on 9/16/2022. (Yanchunis, John)
September 15, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Ryan D. Maxey regarding Assignment of Judges, 3 , Attorney Letter, #4 , Attorney Letter, #5 . Mail resent to Ryan D. Maxey MORGAN, MORGAN LAW FIRM, 7th Floor, 201 North Franklin Street Suite 700 Tampa, FL 33606. (MKR)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision and remains assigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MLF)
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney John A. Yanchunis on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Carlson (Yanchunis, John)
September 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan D. Maxey on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Carlson (Maxey, Ryan)
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ryan D. Maxey has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
September 1, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney John A. Yanchunis has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Nelnet Services, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Murthy, Angeli)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand (CLASS ACTION) against Nelnet Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4703518), by Attorney Angeli Murthy on behalf of Robert Carlson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nelnet Online Privacy Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Security Incident, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murthy, Angeli)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carlson
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Ryan D. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Claudia D. McCarron
Represented By: James Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?