Bump et al v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Pamela Bump, Melissa Charbonneau, Douglas Conley, Noah Helvey, Dallin Iler, Dustin Jones, Devinne Peterson, Justin Randall, Sofia Rodriguez and Rachel Woods
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03204
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Amended by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendants Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC.(Monagle, James)
November 3, 2022 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing, LLC. by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendants Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC.(Monagle, James)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before December 15, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
November 3, 2022 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #17 for attorney James Monagle. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 20, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4736913 by Attorney James Monagle on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Monagle, James)
October 20, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Claudia D. McCarron. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
October 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4736757 by Attorney Claudia D. McCarron on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(McCarron, Claudia)
September 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance Zachary A. Rynar by Attorney Zachary A. Rynar on behalf of Plaintiff Pamela Bump (Rynar, Zachary)
September 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance Steven L. Bloch by Attorney Steven L. Bloch on behalf of Plaintiff Pamela Bump (Bloch, Steven)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Johnathan P. Seredynski on behalf of Plaintiffs Pamela Bump, Melissa Charbonneau, Douglas Conley, Noah Helvey, Dallin Iler, Dustin Jones, Devinne Peterson, Justin Randall, Sofia Rodriguez, Rachel Woods (Seredynski, Johnathan)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Christian Levis on behalf of Plaintiffs Pamela Bump, Melissa Charbonneau, Douglas Conley, Noah Helvey, Dallin Iler, Dustin Jones, Devinne Peterson, Justin Randall, Sofia Rodriguez, Rachel Woods (Levis, Christian)
September 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Anthony M. Christina on behalf of Plaintiffs Pamela Bump, Melissa Charbonneau, Douglas Conley, Noah Helvey, Dallin Iler, Dustin Jones, Devinne Peterson, Justin Randall, Sofia Rodriguez, Rachel Woods (Christina, Anthony)
September 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ian W. Sloss on behalf of Plaintiffs Pamela Bump, Melissa Charbonneau, Douglas Conley, Noah Helvey, Dallin Iler, Dustin Jones, Devinne Peterson, Justin Randall, Sofia Rodriguez, Rachel Woods (Sloss, Ian)
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Anthony M. Christina has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Johnathan Seredynski has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Christian Levis has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Zachary Rynar has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ian W. Sloss has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Steven L. Bloch has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
September 15, 2022 Remark - Public (Related Case): This notice serves to advise the parties that pursuant to direction from Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., this case is related to 4:22cv3181 and assigned to District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Any challenge to this assignment must be made pursuant to NEGenR 1.4(a)(7). (TCL)
September 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nelnet Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4711780), by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Pamela Bump(Carney, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bump et al v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Bump
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Charbonneau
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Conley
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Helvey
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallin Iler
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Jones
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devinne Peterson
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Randall
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Rodriguez
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Woods
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Johnathan P. Seredynski
Represented By: Zachary A. Rynar
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jeana L. Goosmann
Represented By: Joseph V. Messineo
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Claudia D. McCarron
Represented By: James Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?