State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2023cv03023
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon (Amended Proof of Service) defendant United States of America on 3/6/2023. (Storz, Christopher)
March 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of regarding Complaint #1 , Summons Requested #3 , Summons Requested #4 MAILING TO USPS by Attorney Christopher R. Storz on behalf of Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Storz, Christopher)
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon U.S. Attorney for the District of Nebraska - defendant United States of America on 3/1/2023. (Storz, Christopher)
March 8, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Attorney General of the defendant United States of America on 3/6/2023. (Storz, Christopher)
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant United States of America, U.S. Attorney's Office and U.S. Attorney General. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
February 24, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 . (Storz, Christopher)
February 24, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint #1 . (Storz, Christopher)
February 24, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher R. Storz on behalf of Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Storz, Christopher)
February 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4810542), by Attorney Christopher R. Storz on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Storz, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Storz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?