Sova v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Plaintiff: Krysti Sova
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Case Number: 4:2023cv03121
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/2/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Nebraska Department of Correctional Services (Fern, Erik)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before August 31, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Department of Correctional Services.(Fern, Erik)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Department of Correctional Services (Fern, Erik)
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nebraska Department of Correctional Services on 7/13/2023. (Wilbrand, Charles)
July 11, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Wilbrand, Charles)
July 6, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nebraska Department of Correctional Services ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4894201), by Attorney Charles E. Wilbrand on behalf of Krysti Sova(Wilbrand, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sova v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krysti Sova
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Represented By: Grant M. Paschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Represented By: Erik W. Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?