Wardell v. Westman
Petitioner: Wendel Robert Wardell
Respondent: John Westman
Case Number: 4:2023cv03200
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT - PRO SE: Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered this date, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: This case is dismissed without prejudice because Petitioner failed to prosecute it and failed to comply with this Court's orders. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. The Court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
November 1, 2023 Filing 5 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Wendel Robert Wardell. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (MKR)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the Clerk's Office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/22/2023: Check for MIFP or payment.) Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed with AO240 form)(MKR)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (MKR)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of Petitioner Wendel Robert Wardell. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wardell v. Westman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wendel Robert Wardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Westman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?