SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc. v. Drugsite Limited et al
Plaintiff: SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc.
Defendant: Drugsite Limited and Drugsite Limited, as Trustee of The Drugsite Trust
Case Number: 4:2023cv03232
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - The plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (filing #4 ) is granted. The defendants; all officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys of the defendants; and all others in in active concert or participation with the defendants; are enjoined in the United States and all territory which is under its jurisdiction and control from Marketing, advertising, or promoting services bearing the SAVERX Mark or any other mark that is a counterfeit, copy, simulation, confusingly similar variation, or colorable imitation of the plaintiff's SAV-RX Mark; Using the SAVERX Markor any other mark that is a counterfeit, copy, simulation, confusingly similar variation, or colorable imitation of the plaintiff's SAV-RX Markwhen contracting with pharmacies; and Registering or applying to register any trademark, service mark, domain name, trade name, or other source identifier or symbol of origin consisting of or incorporating the SAVERX Mark, or any other mark that infringes or is likely to be confused with the plaintiff's SAV-RX Mark. The plaintiff is directed to provide the defendants with effective service of this order by the most efficient available means. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 EXHIBIT LIST from Motion Hearing held December 22, 2023. (KMM)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 WITNESS LIST from Motion Hearing held December 22, 2023. (KMM)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge John M. Gerrard in Lincoln on 12/22/2023. Argument held on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #4 . Evidence by plaintiff. Plaintiff may submit a proposed order by 12/28/2023. Matter taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael F. Coyle, Alexander Arkfeld; for Defendants: No appearance by defendants or counsel; Courtroom Deputy: Kathy Miller; Court Reporter: Lisa Grimminger. Time Start: 10:02 AM; Time Stop: 10:54 AM; Time in Court: 52 Minutes. (KMM)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Michael F. Coyle by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Plaintiff SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19)(Coyle, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #4 filed by SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc. The plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order is denied. A hearing on the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is set for December 22, 2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendants Drugsite Limited and Drugsite Limited, as Trustee of The Drugsite Trust. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a trademark. Complaint filed on 11/30/2023. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LRM)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 INDEX in support of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #4 by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Plaintiff SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael F. Coyle, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Coyle, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #4 by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Plaintiff SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Plaintiff SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Drugsite Limited, as Trustee of The Drugsite Trust regarding Complaint, #1 . (Coyle, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Drugsite Limited regarding Complaint, #1 . (Coyle, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4985579), by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Coyle, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc. v. Drugsite Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAV-RX Prescription Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Arkfeld
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drugsite Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drugsite Limited, as Trustee of The Drugsite Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?