Marcus v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Baha Marcus
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company doing business as Lincoln Financial Group formerly known as Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, CSL Behring, LLC and Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 4:2024cv03096
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2024 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMW)
July 15, 2024 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant CSL Behring, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMW)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WebEx CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
July 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/12/2024.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
July 12, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by CSL Behring, LLC, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Davidson, Steven)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown, Defendants shall have an extension of time to July 12, 2024, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
June 18, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendants CSL Behring, LLC, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement 4 is stricken for the following reason(s): Filed in error. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement 3 is stricken for the following reason(s): Filed in error. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants CSL Behring, LLC and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to CSL Behring, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Newcomb, Emily)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company d/b/a Lincoln Financial Group f/k/a Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston regarding Complaint, #1 . (Newcomb, Emily)
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 (STRICKEN) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant CSL Behring, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMW) Modified on 5/29/2024 to strike per 9 (RMW).
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 (STRICKEN) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMW) Modified on 5/29/2024 to strike per 8 (RMW).
May 23, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Susan M. Bazis and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSL Behring, LLC, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5094799), by Attorney Emily T. Newcomb on behalf of Baha Marcus (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newcomb, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company doing business as Lincoln Financial Group formerly known as Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSL Behring, LLC
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baha Marcus
Represented By: Emily Newcomb Haggstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?