Wickizer v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Patsy Wickizer
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2024cv03192
Filed: October 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Ryan C Carson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Indiana, Docket No. 2570. (LKO)
November 20, 2024 Filing 7 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Indiana, Docket No. 2570. (LKO)
November 20, 2024 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Indiana. Original electronic file sent. (LKO)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (TEXT ONLY) Following Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carsons swearing in as a United States Magistrate Judge on November 1, 2024, and in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ryan C. Carson for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.(JLS)
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Ogborn, Michael)
October 22, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 21, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Cook Group Inc., Cook Inc., Cook Medical Inc., Cook Medical LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Ogborn, Michael)
October 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand 4:24-cv-3192 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5184421), by Attorney Michael Jon Ogborn on behalf of Patsy Wickizer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ogborn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wickizer v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Wickizer
Represented By: Michael Jon Ogborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?